1. Would you like to join the IL team? See open jobs!
    Dismiss Notice
  2. What can you teach someone online? Tell us here!
    Dismiss Notice
  3. If someone taught you via skype, what would you want to learn? Tell us here!
    Dismiss Notice

vedic maths tricks

Discussion in 'Education & Personal Growth' started by ramshree, Jun 2, 2010.

  1. ramshree

    ramshree New IL'ite

    Messages:
    96
    Likes Received:
    1
    Trophy Points:
    8
    Gender:
    Female
    Hi,
    regards,
    I am studing vedic maths .do someone want to join me.I am sending one of the tricks that i had discovered.
    FIND THE SQUARES
    a) 44444^2=
    b) 555^2=
    c) 99999^2=
    d) 66666^2=
    now we can observe the repetition of a digit in all these numbers. In such pattern we can use the duplex method to find the square.
    a) 44444^2=
    · count the 4's
    · it comes for 5 times in the numbers
    · so now in ans. write down square of 4 that is 16 as the last part of the ans.
    · than go on writing table of 16 for 5 times (duplex of the numbers will give us the table of 16)
    · than reverse of the table of 16 up to 1
    · 16/32/48/64/80/64/48/32/16
    · as we know tens digits are carry overs so our ans. is
    · 1975269136
    b) 555^2=25/50/75/50/25=308025
    what if the numbers are
    a)1212^2
    b)1414^2
    a)2121^2
    I know ! do you?:wave
     
    Loading...

  2. Pavithra55

    Pavithra55 Gold IL'ite

    Messages:
    3,656
    Likes Received:
    79
    Trophy Points:
    130
    Gender:
    Female
    hmm your brillant. i hate maths. just felt like going through the thread. omg. i cant
     
  3. Gayathri47

    Gayathri47 Silver IL'ite

    Messages:
    1,573
    Likes Received:
    12
    Trophy Points:
    68
    Gender:
    Female
    Last year, I was so fired up to learn Vedic maths that I bought myself a book (a rather good book) and started it! But, alas I gave up with lack of time. You have just reminded me to learn it again.

    Thank you for the formula, they are really so useful.
    Esp. I had been planning to give CAT this year, so makes it all the more useful.

    Consider me in to study it. I will post some tricks too!
     
  4. ramshree

    ramshree New IL'ite

    Messages:
    96
    Likes Received:
    1
    Trophy Points:
    8
    Gender:
    Female
    Hi Gayathri
    Thanks for the reply.Welcome to the thread.Vedic maths will work for CAT exams also. It depends on us "how do we go through it.
    Consider basic rule of vedic maths.
    " by observation"

    If i have operations like
    1. 2*3=
    2. 6/2=
    3. 5+6=
    4. 9-4=
    5. 6/10=
    Then a child will pronounce it loudly as "two into three is equal to 6".You know when we do such calculations our mind also pronouces the same though mentally. We need to stop this habit. Just look at the number and operation and write the ans.as 6,3,11,5,0.6.if we develop this habit with sigle digit numbers,we can go with complex caculations without any difficulty.Next time I will begin with double digit multiplication.
    all the best for exams.

    regards
     
  5. ramshree

    ramshree New IL'ite

    Messages:
    96
    Likes Received:
    1
    Trophy Points:
    8
    Gender:
    Female
    Hi all,
    Just go through this pattern of multiplication.

    34*36=

    as you can follow
    • tens digits are same in both the numbers.
    • unit digits adds up to ten as 4+6=10
    in such patterns ans. is given in two parts
    previous part /last part
    for previous part we follow "the rule one more than the one before " ie we have 3 in ten place, in ans for the previous part we will we multipliy this 3 with one more of 3 that is 4.so in this operation previous part of the ans is 3*4=12
    and last part of the ans is 6*4=24
    so 34*36=12/24 =1224
    in vedic maths we divide the ans in different part with sign "/"
    now Go with these
    73*77=7*8/7*3=56/21=5621
    68*62=6*7/8*2=42/16=4216
    41*49=?
    86*84=?
    99*91=?:bonk
     
  6. september

    september Bronze IL'ite

    Messages:
    651
    Likes Received:
    8
    Trophy Points:
    40
    Gender:
    Female
    good thread ...
    long back , when in school our principal had introduced this ... but did not understand much of it ...
    keep going , its good to learn these things
     
  7. Gayathri47

    Gayathri47 Silver IL'ite

    Messages:
    1,573
    Likes Received:
    12
    Trophy Points:
    68
    Gender:
    Female
    Thanks Ramshree for the new inputs!

    Just to answer the questions (I have used the vedic method)

    41*49= 4*5/1*9 = 20/09 = 2009
    86*84= 8*9/6*4 = 72/36 = 7236

    99*91=9*10/9*1 = 90/09 = 9009

    Just an extra point to Rule in post number 4.
    When you get a single digit in the "last part", like the example above where 1 * 9 = 9 - one should use 09 (2 digits) in he later part
     
  8. ramshree

    ramshree New IL'ite

    Messages:
    96
    Likes Received:
    1
    Trophy Points:
    8
    Gender:
    Female
    Hi all,:thankyou2: for the support.
    U raised a good point.in multiplication of the pattern when final digit adds up to ten and ten digits are same .If we get one digit ans for the last part then we write it with one additional zero before the digit.you know why?


    go through this ID (x+a)(x+b)=x^2+x(a+b)+ab
    now in case of 34*36
    expandthe numbers
    34=30+4
    36=30+6
    consider x=30,a=4and b=6
    put the values in the ID
    (30+4)(30+6)
    =30^2+30(4+6)+4*6
    =30*30+30*10+24
    =30(30+10)+24
    =30*40+24
    =3*4*100+24
    =1200
    + 24
    -------
    1224
    vedic maths eliminates this "100 and + sign with / "
    and the ans becomes

    =3*4/24
    = 12/24
    =1224
    same in case of 41*49
    =4*5*100+9 becomes
    2000
    + 9
    --------------
    2009
    so this is the basic logic of that extra zero.
    next time some more new patterns.:coffee
     
    Last edited: Jun 10, 2010
  9. Gayathri47

    Gayathri47 Silver IL'ite

    Messages:
    1,573
    Likes Received:
    12
    Trophy Points:
    68
    Gender:
    Female
    Okay, so I am a bit confused over here. Please help

    If 36 * 34 is there
    We get 3*4 / 6*4 = 1224 as the answer, how did we get this 4 in 3*4 ?

    Is it that we have to multiply by the next number?
     
  10. ramshree

    ramshree New IL'ite

    Messages:
    96
    Likes Received:
    1
    Trophy Points:
    8
    Gender:
    Female
    OK! just go through my last post.
    come to the step
    =30*40+24
    =3*4*100+24
    in this step "*100+" part of the calculation is replcaed by the sign /
    So the next step becomes
    =3*4/24
    =12/24
    =1224
    We must know from where does this next number comes ? This explanation can lead us to discover some new trick .
    now come to the point.
    For all the calculation which follows the pattern


    " when last digits adds up to ten and final digits are same." follow the rule.
    • final digit*next number of final digit /mutiplication of unit digits.
    • if last part of the ans is a single digit then it should be follow by the a zero as in case of 41*49=4*5/1*9=20/09=2009.
    now we can solve these in seconds.


    just follow the rule " BY OBSERVATION"and write the ans. without pronouncing any thing in your mind and observe the difference of time taken for the calculation.
    1. 46*44=
    2. 77*73=
    3. 112*118=
    4. 129*121=
    5. 98*92=
    6. 53*57=
    7. 102*108=(concider 10 as final digit so final part is ( 10*11)
    8. 68*62=
    9. 59*51=
    10. 52*58=
    score------ time taken----------
    next time i want to post base multiplication .
     
    Last edited: Jun 14, 2010

Share This Page